Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company As Subrogee Of Gary Sharp, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Mulkey, Mathew E., against Discount Tire Direct, Inc. And Discount Tire Company Of Texas, Inc., represented by Mathis, Dena L, in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts JP1.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2013 |
CategorySmall Claim |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Filing Court HouseJP1 |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Trial Before the Court | |
April 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Nonsuit | |
April 29, 2016 | Docket Event | $DISP | |
February 10, 2016 | Docket Event | COMMENT | |
November 04, 2014 | Docket Event | Trial Before the Court | |
November 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Motion for Continuance | |
January 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Answer | |
December 27, 2013 | Docket Event | Conversion | |
December 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
Citation Name: DISCOUNT TIRE DIRECT, INC. Type: CIT County: ROCKWALL Authority: 1 Status: S,N Return: Clerk |
|
December 27, 2013 | Docket Event | z(LAC) Original Petition CSRP |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.