Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ford Motor Credit Company Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Runge, Matthew Scott, against Phillips, Scott B, Phillips, Christine L, represented by Rybicki, Klint, in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts JP1.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2013 |
CategoryDebt Claim |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseJP1 |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 21, 2015 | Docket Event | Release of Judgment | |
January 16, 2015 | Docket Event | Agreed Order | |
January 16, 2015 | Docket Event | $DISP | |
July 01, 2014 | Docket Event | Trial Before the Court | |
January 16, 2014 | Docket Event | Answer | |
December 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Citation Name: PHILLIPS, CHRISTINE L Type: CIT County: ROCKWALL Authority: 1 Status: S,N Return: Clerk |
|
December 20, 2013 | Docket Event | z(LAC) Original Petition CSRP | |
December 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Service | |
December 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Citation Name: PHILLIPS, SCOTT B Type: CIT County: ROCKWALL Authority: 1 Status: N Return: Clerk |
|
December 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Conversion |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.