Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Pharia, Llc, filed a(n) Other Civil Suits case represented by Hayes, Kris Balekian, Gerber, Yonatan Z, against Ryan, Maryann, in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts JP1.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 15, 2009 |
CategoryOther Civil Suits |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
|
Filing Court HouseJP1 |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 20, 2019 | Docket Event | ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT | |
June 29, 2017 | Docket Event | COMMENT | |
July 21, 2010 | Docket Event | COMMENT | |
July 21, 2010 | Docket Event | Trial Before the Court | |
July 16, 2010 | Docket Event | COMMENT | |
June 28, 2010 | Docket Event | COMMENT | |
April 28, 2010 | Docket Event | ALTERNATE SERVICE | |
December 15, 2009 | Docket Event | Conversion | |
December 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Citation Name: RYAN, MARYANN Type: CIT County: ROCKWALL Authority: Clerk Status: AS,N REC'VD AFFIDAVIT FROM PCP, DALLAS INCReturn: Clerk |
|
December 15, 2009 | Docket Event | Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.