Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) case represented by Carnohan, Chris, against Magee, Kellye M, in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts with Beaty, Nancy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2009 |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 31, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 28, 2011 | Docket Event | Trial Before the Court | |
April 28, 2011 | Docket Event | COMMENT | |
April 28, 2011 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT FOR THE PLAINTIFF | |
March 10, 2010 | Docket Event | Motion for Continuance | |
March 10, 2010 | Docket Event | Trial Before the Court | |
March 09, 2010 | Docket Event | COMMENT | |
March 08, 2010 | Docket Event | COMMENT | |
February 25, 2010 | Docket Event | COMMENT | |
February 09, 2010 | Docket Event | z(LAC) Motion for New Trial | |
January 20, 2010 | Docket Event | Original Answer |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.