Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Progressive Concepts Inc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Hrabal, Michael, against Gary, Shawn Jerome, in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts JP2 with Holloway, Larry presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2004 |
CategorySmall Claim |
Last RefreshedDecember 31, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Filing Court HouseJP2 |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 19, 2009 | Docket Event | Release of Judgment | |
April 12, 2005 | Docket Event | COMMENT | |
April 12, 2005 | Docket Event | Trial Before the Court | |
April 12, 2005 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JUDGMENT RENDERED | |
April 12, 2005 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT FOR THE PLAINTIFF | |
March 10, 2005 | Docket Event | z(LAC) Motion for New Trial | |
January 31, 2005 | Docket Event | Original Answer | |
January 18, 2005 | Docket Event | Service | |
December 22, 2004 | Docket Event | Conversion | |
December 22, 2004 | Docket Event |
Citation Name: GARY, SHAWN JEROME Type: CIT County: ROCKWALL Authority: Clerk Status: NOfficer: 402 Return: Clerk |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.