Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Buchanan, Brenna filed a(n) case against Harker, Todd Edward, represented by Fichtel, Suzanne, in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts with Williams, J. Brian presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 31, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Discharging Community Supervision | |
August 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Letter | |
August 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Other | |
August 08, 2019 | Docket Event | State Motion | |
August 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Docket Call | |
August 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Next Court Setting | |
July 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Bond | |
July 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Summons | |
June 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Warrant Returned | |
April 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Warrant Open |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.