Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Hill, Jeffrey filed a(n) case against Castillo-Torres, Dilan Axel, represented by Scott, Mark, in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts with Williams, J. Brian presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 30, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Plea | |
July 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Dismissal | |
June 12, 2017 | Docket Event | Request for Next Court Setting | |
May 05, 2017 | Docket Event | Request for Next Court Setting | |
April 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Request for Next Court Setting | |
March 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Request for Next Court Setting | |
February 23, 2017 | Docket Event | Request for Next Court Setting | |
February 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Bond | |
January 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Complaint (OCA) | |
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.