Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Dubois, Grant filed a(n) Jp/City case against Masciale, Vito Francesco, Jr., represented by Wietzel, Glen, in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law 1 with Williams, J. Brian presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2016 |
CategoryJp/City |
Last RefreshedDecember 30, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
|
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law 1 |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 25, 2017 | Docket Event | Dismissal | |
May 25, 2017 | Docket Event | Plea | |
May 04, 2017 | Docket Event | Request for Next Court Setting | |
April 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Request for Next Court Setting | |
March 23, 2017 | Docket Event | Request for Next Court Setting | |
February 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Certification Of Call | |
February 23, 2017 | Docket Event | Request for Next Court Setting | |
February 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Request for Next Court Setting | |
January 12, 2017 | Docket Event | Request for Next Court Setting | |
December 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Summons Request and Issued |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.