Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Almand, Justin filed a(n) case against Flores, Natalia Marie, represented by Davila, Lara Bracamonte, in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts with Williams, J. Brian presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2016 |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 30, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event | BF-Agreed Judgment | |
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Plea Papers | |
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Call | |
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Bond | |
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Warrant Returned | |
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons | |
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Judgment Nisi | |
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Bond Forfeiture Warrant | |
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Certification Of Call | |
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Next Court Setting |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.