Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ace Bonding Agency filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Currens, Tiffany Wynee, represented by Murphy, Amanda, in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law 1 with Williams, J. Brian presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2014 |
CategoryAdult Misdemeanor |
Last RefreshedJanuary 01, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law 1 |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Order Discharging Community Supervision | |
September 14, 2015 | Docket Event | TP Plan Fee Paid | |
May 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Docket Call | |
May 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Plea Papers | |
April 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Request for Next Court Setting | |
April 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Request for Next Court Setting | |
March 19, 2015 | Docket Event | Request for Next Court Setting | |
February 26, 2015 | Docket Event | Request for Next Court Setting | |
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Request for Next Court Setting | |
January 12, 2015 | Docket Event | Request for Next Court Setting |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.