Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Donna Fletcher D B A, Taylor Bail Bonds filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Worsham, Parker Irlanda, represented by Lemmons, Robert W, in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law 1 with Williams, J. Brian presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2013 |
CategoryAdult Misdemeanor |
Last RefreshedJanuary 01, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law 1 |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Dismissal | |
April 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Docket Call | |
April 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Request for Next Court Setting | |
March 20, 2014 | Docket Event | Request for Next Court Setting | |
February 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Request for Next Court Setting | |
February 06, 2014 | Docket Event | Request for Next Court Setting | |
January 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Bond | |
December 27, 2013 | Docket Event | Criminal Case Filed (OCA) | |
December 27, 2013 | Docket Event | Complaint & Information | |
December 19, 2013 | Docket Event | Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.