Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
The State Of Texas filed a(n) case against Gonzales, Andrew, in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts with David Edgar Rakow presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2009 |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 30, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 12, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE | |
March 05, 2010 | Docket Event | Written Admonishments Of Defendants Right To Counsel | |
March 05, 2010 | Docket Event | Revocation of Probation | |
March 05, 2010 | Docket Event | Affidavit | |
March 05, 2010 | Docket Event | CJIS Completed | |
March 05, 2010 | Docket Event | Motion to Revoke Admonishment | |
March 04, 2010 | Docket Event | Warrant Returned | |
December 23, 2009 | Docket Event | Warrant Open | |
December 22, 2009 | Docket Event | Motion to Revoke Probation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.