Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
The State Of Texas filed a(n) case against Lee, Johnny M., represented by Easter, Terese, in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts with David Edgar Rakow presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2005 |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 30, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2006 | Docket Event | Motion | |
September 29, 2006 | Docket Event | Attorney Fees | |
September 29, 2006 | Docket Event | Revocation of Probation | |
September 15, 2006 | Docket Event | Appointment of Attorney | |
September 14, 2006 | Docket Event | Warrant Disposed | |
June 20, 2006 | Docket Event | Warrant Open | |
June 16, 2006 | Docket Event | Motion to Revoke Probation | |
December 19, 2005 | Docket Event | CJIS Completed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.