Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ahern Rentals, Inc., filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case represented by Richey, T. Ragon, against Bank Of America, in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law 1 with Rakow, David E presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedDecember 30, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
|
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law 1 |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 09, 2010 | Docket Event | 306A Letter | |
August 05, 2010 | Docket Event | Order | |
August 05, 2010 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal | |
August 05, 2010 | Docket Event | $DISP | |
August 05, 2010 | Docket Event | Docket Call | |
July 15, 2010 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM JUDGE | |
July 14, 2010 | Docket Event | Docket Call | |
June 22, 2010 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM JUDGE | |
June 18, 2010 | Docket Event | Status Check | |
May 25, 2010 | Docket Event | WRIT OF GARNISHMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.