Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ethridge, Russell, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Rybicki, Klint, against Fields, Danny Eugene, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts JP3 with Russo, Mark presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 08, 2016 |
CategoryLandlord Tenant |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Filing Court HouseJP3 |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 11, 2017 | Docket Event | WRIT RTN SERVED | |
January 09, 2017 | Docket Event | Motion Filed | |
January 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession | |
December 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Forcible Detainer | |
December 08, 2016 | Docket Event | PAPERS SERVED | |
December 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Citation | |
December 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.