Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Harrell, Steven R. filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law 1 with Williams, J. Brian presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliams, J. Brian Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 10, 2020 |
CategoryLetters Of Testamentary |
Last RefreshedNovember 05, 2020 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law 1 |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Coordinator Status Check | |
October 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit | |
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event | PUBLISHERS AFFIDAVIT | |
October 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Prove Up | |
September 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Death and Other Facts | |
September 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Oath | |
September 28, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER PROBATING WILL | |
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event | APPLICATION | |
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL WILL | |
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event | COPY OF WILL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.