Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Ratcliffe, Michele filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law 1 with Williams, J. Brian presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliams, J. Brian Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 30, 2017 |
CategoryGuardianship Of A Minor |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law 1 |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Show Cause Hearing | |
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Annual or Final Accounts Filed (OCA) | |
November 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Letter | |
October 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Coordinator Status Check | |
August 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Coordinator Status Check | |
December 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Approving Annual Accounting | |
December 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Order | |
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion | |
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Annual or Final Accounts Filed (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.