Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Action Bail Bond filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Harrison, Landon Adam, represented by Wheeler, Keith, in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts 439th District Court with Rakow, David E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRakow, David E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 17, 2020 |
CategoryAdult Felony |
Last RefreshedNovember 05, 2020 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court House439th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Final Announcement | |
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Setting Hearing | |
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Hearing | |
September 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Hearing | |
September 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Setting Hearing | |
August 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Waiver of Arraignment | |
August 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Hearing | |
August 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Setting Hearing | |
August 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit | |
July 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Report Back |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.