Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Almand, Justin filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Hargis, Jessica Dawn, represented by Hartley, Tim, in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law 1 with Williams, J. Brian presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliams, J. Brian Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 18, 2019 |
CategoryAdult Felony |
Last RefreshedDecember 31, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law 1 |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Order | |
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Setting Hearing | |
April 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion | |
July 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Announcement | |
June 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
June 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Trial Courts Certification of Defenant Right of Appeal | |
June 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Bill of Cost - CR | |
June 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Waiver of Arraignment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.