Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Glen Cox filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Martinez Viveros, Ulises, represented by Kuhner, Christopher R., Barnes Smith, Jennifer, in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts 439th District Court with Rakow, David E presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2018 |
CategoryAdult Felony |
Last RefreshedNovember 05, 2020 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court House439th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Jury Trial | |
October 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice | |
October 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice | |
October 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice | |
October 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Subpoena Return | |
October 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Hearing | |
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Subpoena | |
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Application for Subpoena | |
July 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Jury Trial | |
March 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Application for Subpoena |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.