Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Oliphant, Felicia filed a(n) case against Robertson, Damorian Dente, represented by Waldrop, Buford D., in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts with David Edgar Rakow presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 16, 2015 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 01, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Request | |
April 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Request | |
June 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Motion and Order for Disposition of Evidence | |
March 04, 2016 | Docket Event | PENPACK/DOC CHECKLIST/COMMITMENT | |
March 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Judgment of Conviction - Guilty Plea or No Contest (OCA) | |
March 01, 2016 | Docket Event | DOCKET SHEET | |
March 01, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER PAY ATTORNEY | |
March 01, 2016 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF DISCLOSURE | |
March 01, 2016 | Docket Event | FELONY COURT COST | |
March 01, 2016 | Docket Event | WRITTEN PLEA ADMONISHMENTS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.