Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Conradt, Louis W., Jr. filed a(n) case against Jones, Odis, Jr., represented by Massar, Johannes, in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts with Brett Allen Hall presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2005 |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 30, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2006 | Docket Event | TDCJ PAROLE DIVISION REPORT | |
March 07, 2006 | Docket Event | DOCKET SHEET | |
March 07, 2006 | Docket Event | TRACKING FORM FOR DPS | |
March 02, 2006 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS AND ORDER | |
February 23, 2006 | Docket Event | Order Setting Hearing | |
February 23, 2006 | Docket Event | Final Announcement | |
February 09, 2006 | Docket Event | Order Setting Hearing | |
February 09, 2006 | Docket Event | 2nd Announcement | |
January 27, 2006 | Docket Event | LETTER | |
January 24, 2006 | Docket Event | Order Setting Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.