Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
The State Of Texas filed a(n) case against Price, Candie Crystal, represented by Hopson, Raymond, in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts with Brett Allen Hall presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 13, 2005 |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 30, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 07, 2011 | Docket Event | REQUEST | |
April 03, 2007 | Docket Event | LETTER | |
April 21, 2006 | Docket Event | TDCJ PAROLE DIVISION REPORT | |
March 27, 2006 | Docket Event | DOCKET SHEET | |
March 23, 2006 | Docket Event | PENPACK/DOC CHECKLIST/COMMITMENT | |
March 23, 2006 | Docket Event | Commitment | |
March 23, 2006 | Docket Event | PUBLIC RECORD INFORMATION | |
March 23, 2006 | Docket Event | TRACKING FORM FOR DPS | |
March 16, 2006 | Docket Event | FELONY COURT COST | |
March 16, 2006 | Docket Event | ORDER PAY ATTORNEY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.