Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Office Of The Attorney General, filed a(n) Paternity - Family case against Chadwick, Taryn Nicole, Chadwick, Clay Wayne, in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law 1 with Williams, J. Brian presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliams, J. Brian Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 14, 2021 |
CategoryPaternity - Iv-D |
Last RefreshedDecember 30, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
Matter TypePaternity |
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law 1 |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of NonSuit | |
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Request | |
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Process Returned Unserved | |
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Process Return | |
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation | |
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation | |
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) | |
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event | No Fee Document | |
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.