Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Synchrony Bank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Addison, Brandi Marie, against Allen, Jennifer, represented by Castro, Michael R., in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law 1 with Williams, J. Brian presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliams, J. Brian Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 12, 2021 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedDecember 30, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law 1 |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Order of Granting NonSuit | |
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Trial Before the Court | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of NonSuit | |
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion for Default Judgment | |
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Letter | |
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer | |
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Process Return | |
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.