Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Waskow, Justin Allen, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Mentzer, Natalie Kay, in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts 439th District Court with Rakow, David E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRakow, David E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 12, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 30, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House439th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Status Check | |
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Counter-Claim | |
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer | |
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Default Prove Up | |
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion | |
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Process Return | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.