Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Citibank, N.A., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Ford, Joshua, against Holman, Janice K, in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law 2 with Woodward, Stephani presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWoodward, Stephani Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 10, 2021 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law 2 |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event | 306A Letter | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Summary Judgment (OCA) | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Call | |
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion | |
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil Case Questionairre | |
July 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Coordinator Status Check |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.