Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Tbf Financial, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Anderson, Millard O., Jr., against Rosander, Sam, in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts 382nd District Court with Hall, Brett presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 22, 2021 |
CategoryContract - Consumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House382nd District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Request | |
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event | 239A Letter Sent | |
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Default Judgment | |
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion for Default Judgment | |
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate | |
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit | |
January 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation | |
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Process Return |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.