Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Attorney General Of Texas filed a(n) Paternity - Family case against Gutierrez, Maria, Marquez, Hector, in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law 1 with Williams, J. Brian presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 28, 2020 |
CategoryPaternity - Iv-D |
Last RefreshedDecember 30, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
Matter TypePaternity |
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law 1 |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Trial Before the Court | |
December 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
December 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Letter | |
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Mediation Order | |
December 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Coordinator Status Check | |
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Response | |
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Call | |
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Letter from Judge File Copy | |
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Letter from Judge File Copy |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.