Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gatson, Oscar D., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Gatson, Patsy M., in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts 382nd District Court with Hall, Brett presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 29, 2020 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedMarch 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House382nd District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
December 07, 2020 | Docket Event | 306A Letter | |
December 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Docket Call | |
December 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Final Decree of Divorce | |
November 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Letter from Judge File Copy | |
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Docket Call | |
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Letter from Judge File Copy | |
October 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Status Check | |
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.