Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Brown, Johnny M, filed a(n) case against Gong, Xiao Xia, in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts with Brett Allen Hall presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrett Allen Hall Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 30, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 29, 2020 | Docket Event | 306A Letter | |
June 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal | |
June 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Docket Call | |
June 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
May 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Letter from Judge File Copy | |
May 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Docket Call | |
April 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
March 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Docket Call | |
March 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Letter from Judge File Copy | |
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Indigency |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.