Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
American Express National Bank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Degrasse, Donald D., against Bralina Resorts Inc, in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law 1 with Williams, J. Brian presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliams, J. Brian Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2019 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedNovember 05, 2020 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law 1 |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event | 306A Letter | |
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal | |
October 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion | |
October 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Docket Call | |
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Letter from Judge File Copy | |
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Docket Call | |
September 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Letter from Judge File Copy | |
January 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Order | |
January 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Writ |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.