Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc, filed a(n) case represented by Olsen-Zhang, Jessica, against Smith, Barbara, in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts with Williams, J. Brian presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliams, J. Brian Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2019 |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 30, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 20, 2020 | Docket Event | 239A Letter Sent | |
May 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Default Judgment | |
May 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
May 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Coordinator Status Check | |
May 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion for Default Judgment | |
March 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Docket Call | |
March 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Letter from Judge File Copy | |
February 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Coordinator Status Check | |
January 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Process Return | |
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Order for Substitute Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.