Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lamb, Emily Joy, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Lamb, Michael Sean, in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts 439th District Court with Rakow, David E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRakow, David E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2019 |
CategoryProtective Orders |
Last RefreshedDecember 31, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Filing Court House439th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Protective Order | |
February 27, 2020 | Docket Event | 306A Letter | |
February 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Letter | |
February 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Order for Transfer | |
February 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
February 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Agreed Order | |
February 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Protective Order | |
February 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion To Transfer | |
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Certified Mail Return |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.