Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Boryk, Karen J., filed a(n) case against Boryk, Steven S., in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts with Brett Allen Hall presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2014 |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 31, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 04, 2015 | Docket Event | z(LAC) Qualified Domestic Relations Order | |
August 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Request | |
August 14, 2015 | Docket Event | DOCKET SHEET | |
August 14, 2015 | Docket Event | Docket Call | |
August 14, 2015 | Docket Event | Employers Order to Withold Income | |
August 14, 2015 | Docket Event | Kids First Program | |
August 14, 2015 | Docket Event | $DISP | |
August 14, 2015 | Docket Event | Agreed Judgment | |
July 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Letter from Judge File Copy | |
July 24, 2015 | Docket Event | Status Check |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.