Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
De Lacruz-Bejarano, Jose A., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Briones-Martinez, Jacqueline, in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts 382nd District Court with Hall, Brett presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2013 |
CategoryParent-Child Relationship - No Divorce |
Last RefreshedDecember 30, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House382nd District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 04, 2014 | Docket Event | Child Support Information Sheet | |
July 17, 2014 | Docket Event | $DISP | |
July 17, 2014 | Docket Event | 306A Letter | |
July 17, 2014 | Docket Event | ALL OTHER DISPOSITIONS | |
July 17, 2014 | Docket Event | DOCKET SHEET | |
July 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Letter from Judge File Copy | |
July 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Status Check | |
June 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Trial Before the Court | |
May 16, 2014 | Docket Event | Request | |
April 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Request |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.