Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) case represented by Scott, Michael J., against Lynch, Renee L., in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts with Williams, J. Brian presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2013 |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 30, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 11, 2014 | Docket Event | 239A Letter Sent | |
April 10, 2014 | Docket Event | DOCKET SHEET | |
April 10, 2014 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
April 10, 2014 | Docket Event | $DISP | |
April 07, 2014 | Docket Event | CERT/LAST ADDRESS | |
April 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Motion for Default Judgment | |
April 04, 2014 | Docket Event | Docket Call | |
March 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Letter from Judge File Copy | |
January 29, 2014 | Docket Event | CONSTABLE/RETURN | |
December 26, 2013 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.