Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Cavalry Spv I Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Regent, Anh H., against Bittner, Marisa, in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law 1 with Williams, J. Brian presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 16, 2013 |
CategoryContract - Consumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedDecember 30, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law 1 |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 06, 2014 | Docket Event | SHF.RET.-UNSERVED | |
May 28, 2014 | Docket Event | 306A Letter | |
May 23, 2014 | Docket Event | Status Check | |
May 23, 2014 | Docket Event | $DISP | |
May 23, 2014 | Docket Event | DOCKET SHEET | |
May 23, 2014 | Docket Event | DISMISSED | |
April 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Letter from Judge File Copy | |
March 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Letter from Judge File Copy | |
December 17, 2013 | Docket Event | Citation | |
December 16, 2013 | Docket Event | Civil Case Information Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.