Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ramirez, Stacy Stevens, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Ramirez, Ray, in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts 382nd District Court with Hall, Brett presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2011 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 30, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House382nd District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 12, 2012 | Docket Event | 306A Letter | |
June 08, 2012 | Docket Event | DOCKET SHEET | |
June 08, 2012 | Docket Event | Docket Call | |
June 08, 2012 | Docket Event | $DISP | |
June 08, 2012 | Docket Event | DISMISSED | |
May 07, 2012 | Docket Event | Letter from Judge File Copy | |
May 04, 2012 | Docket Event | Status Check | |
March 29, 2012 | Docket Event | Letter | |
March 08, 2012 | Docket Event | Letter from Judge File Copy | |
December 30, 2011 | Docket Event | Case Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.