Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
American Express Centurion Bank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Adams, Michael J., against Brown, Jon, in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law 1 with Williams, J. Brian presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2011 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedDecember 31, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law 1 |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 03, 2012 | Docket Event | DOCKET SHEET | |
July 03, 2012 | Docket Event | DISMISSED | |
July 03, 2012 | Docket Event | $DISP | |
July 02, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF NONSUIT | |
June 29, 2012 | Docket Event | Status Check | |
June 29, 2012 | Docket Event | SHF.RET.-UNSERVED | |
May 18, 2012 | Docket Event | Letter from Judge File Copy | |
May 18, 2012 | Docket Event | Docket Call | |
March 27, 2012 | Docket Event | Letter from Judge File Copy | |
December 27, 2011 | Docket Event | Citation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.