Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
The Office Of The Attorney General, filed a(n) Motion To Enforce case against Roberts, Jamie Nicole, O'Neal, Jason King, in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts 382nd District Court with Hall, Brett presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2014 |
CategoryMotion To Enforce |
Last RefreshedDecember 30, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
|
Filing Court House382nd District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 04, 2016 | Docket Event | Order | |
October 13, 2015 | Docket Event | Order | |
August 11, 2015 | Docket Event | Order | |
May 28, 2015 | Docket Event | 306A Letter | |
May 27, 2015 | Docket Event | $DISP | |
May 27, 2015 | Docket Event | DOCKET SHEET | |
May 27, 2015 | Docket Event | ALL OTHER DISPOSITIONS | |
March 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Note | |
March 15, 2015 | Docket Event | SHF.RET.-UNSERVED | |
March 12, 2015 | Docket Event | CONSTABLE/RETURN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.