Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Rhodes, Sherry, filed a(n) case against Arey, Gary, Wright, Susan Z., Goodman, Michael, Burack, Carese, Jordan, Ann Marie, (total of 11) See All in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts with Brett Allen Hall presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2013 |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 31, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Mandate Return | |
March 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Judgment 5th Court of Appeals | |
March 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Opinion | |
August 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Response | |
July 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Letter | |
July 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Special Appearance | |
June 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Request | |
February 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice | |
February 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Request | |
December 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Letter |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.