Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Nabors, Joan, Nabors, Billy L, filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case represented by Mateer, Jeffrey C., against Aaron, Phillip, Aaron, Lori, in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts 382nd District Court with Hall, Brett presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 15, 2009 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedDecember 29, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
|
Filing Court House382nd District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 31, 2010 | Docket Event | ALL OTHER DISPOSITIONS | |
March 31, 2010 | Docket Event | $DISP | |
March 24, 2010 | Docket Event | Letter from Judge File Copy | |
March 11, 2010 | Docket Event | RELEASE OF JUDGMENT | |
January 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
Writ Name: AARON, PHILLIP Type: WRIT County: Rockwall Authority: District Clerk Status: N Return: District Clerk |
|
January 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
Writ Name: AARON, LORI Type: WRIT County: ROCKWALL COUNTY Authority: DISTRICT CLERK Status: RU,NOfficer: 1004DMD PER ATTY'S OFFICE - WRIT HAS BEEN RECALLED. LT DAVIS SPOKE TO KARA AT 469-698-4033 ON 2-4-10, AND CONFIRMED RECALL ON 2-16-10. Return: JEFFREY C. MATEER, ATTORNEY |
|
January 20, 2010 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment | |
January 20, 2010 | Docket Event | Writ | |
January 20, 2010 | Docket Event | EXECUTION | |
January 08, 2010 | Docket Event | Request |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.