Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Hooey, Karen Jane, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Hooey, Roger John, in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts 382nd District Court with Hall, Brett presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 31, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House382nd District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 16, 2010 | Docket Event | 306A Letter | |
June 11, 2010 | Docket Event | Docket Call | |
June 11, 2010 | Docket Event | $DISP | |
June 11, 2010 | Docket Event | DOCKET SHEET | |
June 11, 2010 | Docket Event | DISMISSED | |
May 28, 2010 | Docket Event | Letter from Judge File Copy | |
January 25, 2010 | Docket Event | CONSTABLE/RETURN | |
January 14, 2010 | Docket Event | COUNTER-CLAIM | |
January 14, 2010 | Docket Event | Answer | |
December 31, 2009 | Docket Event |
Citation Name: HOOEY, ROGER JOHN Type: CIT County: Rockwall Authority: District Clerk Status: S,N Return: District Clerk |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.