Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Freeney, George E., Ii, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Freeney, Maria I., in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law 1 with Rakow, David E presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2009 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 31, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law 1 |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 03, 2010 | Docket Event | Social Study | |
July 20, 2010 | Docket Event | Other | |
July 14, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF NONSUIT | |
July 14, 2010 | Docket Event | $DISP | |
July 14, 2010 | Docket Event | DISMISSED | |
July 14, 2010 | Docket Event | DOCKET SHEET | |
July 09, 2010 | Docket Event | Status Check | |
June 16, 2010 | Docket Event | Status Check | |
March 16, 2010 | Docket Event | Letter | |
February 02, 2010 | Docket Event | Motion |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.