Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Brunson, Wendy Kianne, filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts with David Edgar Rakow presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2009 |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 30, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2010 | Docket Event | 306A Letter | |
June 11, 2010 | Docket Event | $DISP | |
June 11, 2010 | Docket Event | DOCKET SHEET | |
June 11, 2010 | Docket Event | Prove Up | |
June 11, 2010 | Docket Event | ALL OTHER DISPOSITIONS | |
April 09, 2010 | Docket Event | Docket Call | |
March 17, 2010 | Docket Event | Letter | |
February 10, 2010 | Docket Event | Certification | |
December 29, 2009 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) | |
December 29, 2009 | Docket Event | Case Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.