Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bigham, Ashley Renee, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Bailey, Bryan Lynn, in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts 382nd District Court with Hall, Brett presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 16, 2005 |
CategoryParent-Child Relationship - No Divorce |
Last RefreshedJanuary 01, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House382nd District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2006 | Docket Event | Bureau of Vital Statistics | |
August 30, 2006 | Docket Event | DOCKET SHEET | |
August 30, 2006 | Docket Event | 306A Letter | |
August 04, 2006 | Docket Event | ALL OTHER DISPOSITIONS | |
August 04, 2006 | Docket Event | $DISP | |
August 04, 2006 | Docket Event | Docket Call | |
July 21, 2006 | Docket Event | Letter from Judge File Copy | |
June 27, 2006 | Docket Event | Letter from Judge File Copy | |
June 23, 2006 | Docket Event | Status Check | |
May 18, 2006 | Docket Event | Mediation Settle Agreement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.