Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Talley, Christine, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Zuccarelli, Edward, in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts 382nd District Court with Hall, Brett presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2005 |
CategoryAll Other Family Law Matters |
Last RefreshedDecember 30, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Filing Court House382nd District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 21, 2007 | Docket Event | Complaint & Information | |
September 25, 2006 | Docket Event | 306A Letter | |
September 05, 2006 | Docket Event | Complaint & Information | |
September 05, 2006 | Docket Event | DOCKET SHEET | |
September 05, 2006 | Docket Event | Mediation Settle Agreement | |
September 05, 2006 | Docket Event | ORD/AFTER JUDGM-FAMILY | |
September 05, 2006 | Docket Event | $DISP | |
September 01, 2006 | Docket Event | Status Check | |
August 25, 2006 | Docket Event | Docket Call | |
August 08, 2006 | Docket Event | Letter from Judge File Copy |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.