Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lapidos, Mathew Charles, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Lapidos, Patricia Lynn, in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts 382nd District Court with Hall, Brett presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2004 |
CategoryParent-Child Relationship - No Divorce |
Last RefreshedDecember 29, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House382nd District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2007 | Docket Event | Order/Notice Withold Attorney General | |
November 13, 2006 | Docket Event | Order/Notice Withold Attorney General | |
October 11, 2006 | Docket Event | Certified Notice to Employer | |
October 10, 2006 | Docket Event | REQ./ISSUE EMP. ORDER | |
May 15, 2006 | Docket Event | Order/Notice Withold Attorney General | |
April 25, 2006 | Docket Event | Exhibit Transfer Form | |
September 22, 2005 | Docket Event | Order/Notice Withold Attorney General | |
September 22, 2005 | Docket Event | ADMINISTRATIVE WRIT OF WITHHOLDING | |
September 19, 2005 | Docket Event | Letter | |
September 19, 2005 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.