Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Campbell, Portia Ann, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Campbell, Ronald L., in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts 382nd District Court with Hall, Brett presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 08, 2004 |
CategoryParent-Child Relationship - No Divorce |
Last RefreshedDecember 30, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House382nd District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2006 | Docket Event | Letter | |
April 21, 2006 | Docket Event | 306A Letter | |
April 20, 2006 | Docket Event | $DISP | |
April 20, 2006 | Docket Event | Agreed Judgment | |
April 20, 2006 | Docket Event | DOCKET SHEET | |
March 17, 2006 | Docket Event | Status Check | |
February 15, 2006 | Docket Event | OTHER | |
February 15, 2006 | Docket Event | Trial Before the Court | |
February 15, 2006 | Docket Event | Order of Severance | |
February 15, 2006 | Docket Event | Amended Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.